November 30, 2022 |
Filing
83
ORDER that the petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 (ECF No. 11 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/30/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
|
May 26, 2022 |
Filing
82
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Petitioner's Submission of Motion (ECF No. 81 ) is Denied. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/26/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
|
November 17, 2020 |
Filing
76
ORDER granting Nunc Pro Tunc 69 Motion to Extend Time; ORDER granting 73 Motion to Extend Time; ORDER denying 74 Motion; ORDER granting 75 Motion to Extend Time; Petitioner has up to and including 30 days from the date this order is entered to file hisreply to petition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
June 15, 2020 |
Filing
68
ORDER granting 65 Motion; ORDER granting 67 Motion to Extend Time; Respondents answer due within 45 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
April 23, 2020 |
Filing
62
ORDER denying 51 Motion to Stay Case; ORDER denying 52 Motion; within 30 days of the date of this order, petitioner must inform this court (see order for details). Petitioner shall have 30 days following service of respondents' answer in which to file a reply. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
February 20, 2020 |
Filing
49
ORDER denying 46 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER denying 47 Motion for Appointment of Counsel ; petitioner shall have 14 days to either (see order for details). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
February 26, 2019 |
Filing
44
ORDER granting in part 35 Motion to Dismiss (see order for details); Petitioner shall have 30 days to either file a declaration or motion. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
August 29, 2018 |
Filing
43
ORDER denying 32 Motion to Strike; ORDER granting 33 Motion; ORDER denying 34 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER denying 38 Motion to Strike; ORDER denying 40 Motion for Leave to File Document; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Petition to P - JM)
|
March 23, 2018 |
Filing
29
ORDER Granting respondents motion to withdraw motion to dismiss ECF No. 27 is GRANTED. The motion to dismiss ECF No. 17 is WITHDRAWN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall file a renewed motion to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the pet ition, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall have forty-five (45) days from service of the answer, motion to dismiss, or other response to file a reply or opposition, with any other requests f or relief by respondents by motion otherwise being subject to the normal briefing schedule under the local rules. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioners motion for judicial notice ECF No. 14 is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents two motions for extension of time ECF Nos. 16 and 28 are both DENIED as moot.Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/23/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
|
September 29, 2017 |
Filing
10
ORDER granting Petitioner's 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner's 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied. Petitioner's 6 and 7 Motions for copies are denied as moot. The Clerk of the Court shall add Adam Paul Laxalt, Nevada Attorney General as counsel for respondents. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
|