Carrington v. Santander Consumer U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kendra M. Carrington
Defendant: Experian Information Services, Inc. and Santander Consumer U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00038
Filed: January 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 26 Defendant Santander Consumer U.S.A. Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court enter JUDGMENT for Defendant Santander Consumer U.S.A. Inc. and against Plaintiff.Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation to Extend Time re 26 Motion to Dismiss. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 26 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/16/2017. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/20/2017 nunc pro tunc. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. The Court STRIKES the documents filed at Docket Nos. 20 , 21 and instructs the parties to refrain from filing discovery documents on the docket in the future absent a Court order that they do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrington v. Santander Consumer U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra M. Carrington
Represented By: Vernon Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: J. Christopher Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?