McCart-Pollak v. Etkin et al
Plaintiff: Shana Lee McCart-Pollak
Defendant: Edward Etkin and Law Offices of Edward Etkin Esq PC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00042
Filed: January 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting 94 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 91 Motion in Limine. Responses due by 12/4/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 88 Stipulation; Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CLERK'S JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Edward Etkin against Shana Lee McCart-Pollak. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 7/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting Disassociation of Attorney James Murphy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Stipulation re 69 Scheduling Order; Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 65 Proposed Order Submission, Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 67 Stipulated Scheduling Order; Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying 50 Motion to Clarify.; denying 53 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 44 Stipulation Clarifying Due Date for Joint Pretrial Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 22 the Court's 8/11/17 Order is clarified and amended as follows: the parties shall submit a Joint Pretrial Order on or before 11/24/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCart-Pollak v. Etkin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Etkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Edward Etkin Esq PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana Lee McCart-Pollak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?