Latham v. Tutor Perini Building Corp, et al
Plaintiff: Rita Latham
Defendant: Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Tutor Perini Building Corp and Tutor Perini Corporation
Case Number: 2:2017cv00071
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 47 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 25 Motion for Leave to File.; denying 26 Motion to Withdraw.; denying 27 Motion for Leave to File.; granting 28 Stipulation. Defendants shall file the third-partycomplaint by July 13, 2017, and shall serve it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to file a stipulated proposed discovery plan and scheduling order that complies in full with the Local Rules, no later than March 31, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the parties file a joint proposed discovery plan that complies in full with the Court's local rules, no later than March 17, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latham v. Tutor Perini Building Corp, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Latham
Represented By: Andrew Sedlock
Represented By: Anthony P Sgro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Cheryl C. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation
Represented By: Cheryl C. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tutor Perini Building Corp
Represented By: Peter C Brown
Represented By: Troy A Clark
Represented By: Dean M. Tanenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tutor Perini Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?