Pathak v. Pathak et al
Plaintiff: Nerry Pathak
Defendant: Durham Ranch, Raquel Ferrari, Bernadette Flocchini, Bud Flocchini, Chris Flocchini, John Flocchini, Patrick Flocchini, Rich Flocchini, Rick Flocchini, Stephan Flocchini, Stephen J Flocchini, Anshu Bharat Pathak and Sierra Meat and Seafood Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv00102
Filed: January 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying 102 Motion to Set Aside; ORDER denying 104 Motion to Set Aside. Sanctions are imposed against Anshu Pathak. Anshu Pathak is ordered to pay attorneys' fees in the amount of $3442.50 within two (2) weeks of the date of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that sanctions are imposed against Nerry Pathak. Nerry Pathak is ordered to pay attorneys' fees in the amount of $2197.50 within two (2) weeks of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Finance - JM)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 CLERK'S JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Sierra Meat Company against Anshu B. Pathak, Nerry Pathak. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 14 and 57) are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 37, 38 and 43) are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case and all member cases. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/30/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that Defendant / Crossclaimant Anshu Pathak shall not communicate, in person, by email, or by any other means, with any employees, officers, directors, contractors, or agents thereof, of Sierra Meat Company. FURTHER ORDERED that a hearin g regarding Anshu Pathak's discovery conduct and status hearing in this case is set for July 28, 2017 at 4:00 p.m. in courtroom 7D. Anshu Pathak is ordered to appear at this hearing. FURTHER ORDERED that case no. 2:17-cv-01546-RFB-NJK is C ONSOLIDATED with case no. 2:17-cv-00102-RFB-GWF (lead case). FURTHER ORDERED that case no. 2:17-cv-01546-RFB-NJK is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Foley for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than February 10, 2017. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 01/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pathak v. Pathak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durham Ranch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raquel Ferrari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette Flocchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bud Flocchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Flocchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Flocchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Flocchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Flocchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Flocchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephan Flocchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J Flocchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anshu Bharat Pathak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Meat and Seafood Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nerry Pathak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?