ME2 Productions, Inc. v. Does
Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2017cv00123
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of ME2 Productions, Inc. against Savannah Ronfeldet. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 47 plaintiff's motion for default judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall prepare and file an appropriate judgment for the court's signature within twenty-one (21) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 30 Magistrate Judge Koppe's report and recommendation be, and the same hereby is, ADOPTED in part and REJECTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all defendants except for Savannah Ronfeldet be, and the sa me hereby are, dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 9 plaintiff's stipulation to strike defendant Hughes' answer be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 37 plaintiff's motion for entry of clerk's default against defendant Paul Abatie be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 40 plaintiff's motion for entry of clerk's default against defendants Ronfeldet and Dismuke be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The clerk shall enter default against defendant Ronfeldet. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Michael Hughes. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that all Defendants except Defendant Savannah Ronfeldet be SEVERED and DISMISSED without prejudice. To the extent any subpoenas remain outstanding in this case, they are hereby QUASHED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to promptly serve a copy of this order on the recipients of any outstanding subpoenas, and shall file a proof of service of the same by June 20, 2017. Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS the recipients of the subpoenas not to provide the subpoenaed information pending resolution of the order to show cause. Plaintiff is further ORDERED to immediately serve a copy of this order on the recipients of the subpoenas, and to file a proof of service so indicating by noon on 5/12/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 17 Order on Motion to Quash. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file proof of service by noon on 5/10/17. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 12 Motion to Quash. Ms. Pieritz's motion to quash the subpoena to Charter Communications is hereby GRANTED and the subpoena is QUASHED to the extent it relates to Ms. Pieritz. Plaintiff shall immediately serve a copy of this order on Charter Communications, and shall file a proof of service on the docket by noon on 5/8/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 12 Letter. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to file an amended complaint with the identities of Defendants by 4/24/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that this case is transferred to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy Koppe for all further proceedings. All future filings for this case must bear case number 2:17-cv-00123-JCM-NJK. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file a copy of this order in any future case that it files in this district that is related to the Mechanic: Resurrection copyright. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ME2 Productions, Inc. v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?