Bank of New York Mellon v. Stewart Town Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC, Eagle Rock Asset Management, LLC and Stewart Town Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv00128
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation to Stay Litigation. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Time. Eagle Rock Asset Management, LLC answer due 4/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation to Extend Time. Eagle Rock Asset Management, LLC answer due 3/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. Stewart Town Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC
Represented By: Shane D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Rock Asset Management, LLC
Represented By: Zachary P. Takos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Town Homeowners Association
Represented By: Shane D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Represented By: Vatana Lay
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?