Bank of New York Mellon v. SFR Investments Pool I, LLC
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00171
Filed: January 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 32 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Christina Miller and Joseph Dragon for Bank of New York Mellon substituted for Attorney Natalie L Winslow, Darren T Brenner and Jamie K Combs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to LR IA 11-6(d), the substitution of attorney "shall not alone be reason for delay of pretrial proceedings, discovery, the trial, or any hearing in this case." Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Main Document 34 replaced on 5/22/2019) (JQC).
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Lift Stay of Case. Dispositive Motions due by 6/28/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that 25 Motion to Stay Case is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 13 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to its refiling once the certified question has been answered and this stay has been lifted. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that 6 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is stayed by operation of NRS 18.130(1) until the $500 cost bond is deposited. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. SFR Investments Pool I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert
Represented By: Karen L. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?