The Bank of New York Mellon v. Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc., SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv00214
Filed: January 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 104 Motion to Lift Stay Stipulation of Dismissal. Based on the parties' stipulation [ECF No. 104] and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the STAY is LIFTED and all claims in this action are DISMISSED with prejudi ce, EXCEPT for SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's claims against defaulted party Patty Tan, each side to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to REOPEN this case and terminate all parties except for Cross Claimant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Cross Defendant Patty Tan. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 94 Stipulation. Jury Trial reset for 10/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Calendar Call reset for 10/13/2020 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Motions due b y 9/21/2020. Exhibit List due by 10/13/2020. Proposed Jury Instructions due by 10/13/2020. Proposed Voir Dire due by 10/13/2020. Trial Briefs due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER. A settlement conference is set for Tuesday, 12/3/2019. The parties shall report to Magistrate Judge Youchah's chambers in the United States Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Boulevard South, Las Vegas, Nevada, at 9:00 a.m. The settlement conference statements must be delivered to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, 11/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER that Bank of New York Mellon's 70 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED based on genuine issues of fact. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's 72 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. This case is referred to the magistrate judge for a mandatory settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting 80 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 70 and 72 Motions for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 12/3/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 74 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 70 and 72 Second Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/13/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER that 47 and 53 Motions for Summary Judgment are DENIED without prejudice to their refiling no later than October 15, 2018.FURTHER ORDERED that, before the parties may file those revised motions, they must meet and confer as defined by Local Rule IA 1-3(f) about each argument contained in the revised motion. The new motions for summary judgment must be accompanied by a declaration by movant's counsel that sets forth the details and results of the meet-and-confer conference an d that certifies that, despite good faith efforts, the issues could not be resolved. If new motions are filed, briefing will proceed under the schedule prescribed by Local Rule 7-2.FURTHER ORDERED that 67 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 61 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 47 and 53 Motions for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 8/14/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 56 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 8/1/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Second Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 5/30/2018. Motions due by 6/29/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines (First Request). Discovery due by 3/12/2018. Motions due by 4/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 32 Motion to Serve Patty Tan by Publication and Granting 33 Motion to Enlarge Time to Serve Summons and Cross-Claim. The time for service is extended by an additional 60 days from the date of this order is entered to allow SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC to effectuate service by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting the HOA's 11 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs and charges that may be awarded against the Plaintiff in the amount of $500.00. This case is stayed by operation of NRS 18.130(1) until the $500 cost bond is deposited. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon v. Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners Association
Represented By: Ashlie L. Surur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?