MetLife Home Loans LLC v. River Glider Avenue Trust
Plaintiff: MetLife Home Loans LLC
Defendant: River Glider Avenue Trust
Case Number: 2:2017cv00215
Filed: January 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 61 Metlife's renewed motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT 59 River Glider's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT 66 Metlife's unopposed motion for leave to file response out of time be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Metlife shall submit a proposed judgment consistent with the foregoing within ten (10) days of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 49 MOTION to remove attorney Thera A. Cooper, Esq. from the Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 20 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 21 defendant's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall prepare and submit to the court a proposed judgment consistent with the foregoing within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 29 Motion to Remove Attorney Brett M Coombs from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 7 defendant's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MetLife Home Loans LLC v. River Glider Avenue Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MetLife Home Loans LLC
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Brett M Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Glider Avenue Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?