JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al v. 7290 Sheared Cliff Lane UN 102 Trust et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: 7290 Sheared Cliff Lane UN 102 Trust, Resources Group, LLC and Solana Del Mar Community Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv00225
Filed: January 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 26 plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 12 the Trust's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, DENIE D.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 45 the Trust's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 30 plaintiffs' stipulation for extension of time be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED nunc pro tunc.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 42 the Trust's motion to strike be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation to Set Aside re 23 Clerk's Entry of Default. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Denying 35 Motion to Stay re Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al v. 7290 Sheared Cliff Lane UN 102 Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7290 Sheared Cliff Lane UN 102 Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resources Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solana Del Mar Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Chet A Glover
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Chet A Glover
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?