Greiss v. Colvin et al

Plaintiff: Laura Greiss
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2017cv00235
Filed: January 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CLERK'S JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Laura Greiss and against Nancy A. Berryhill in the amount of $10,110.60. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 4/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 35 Motion to Extend Time re 33 Motion for Attorney Fees (Second Request). Responses due by 2/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 27 the Report and Recommendation is REJECTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment is GRANTED and 18 that Defendant's Cross-Motion to Affirm is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter a final judgment in favor of Plaintiff, and against Defendant. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 27 Report and Recommendation (First Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Instructing Clerk's Office to Substitute Nancy A. Berryhill in place of Carolyn W. Colvin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greiss v. Colvin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Greiss
Represented By: Richard E. Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?