Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust IV, by U.S. Bank National Association, as Legal Title Trustee v. Antelope Homeowners Association
Plaintiff: PROF-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust IV
Defendant: Antelope Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv00247
Filed: January 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 13 Motion to Dismiss; The moving party shall have 21 days from the date of the Nevada Supreme Court's decision on the certified question to file a modified Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines re 13 MOTION to Dismiss re 1 Complaint. ( Responses due by 9/4/2017., Replies due by 9/11/2017.) Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 7 Stipulation for an Extension of Time. Antelope Homeowners Association answer due 4/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust IV, by U.S. Bank National Association, as Legal Title Trustee v. Antelope Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antelope Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROF-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust IV
Represented By: John S. Dolembo
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?