Houle v. Mirage Casino-Hotel et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Houle
Defendant: Bartenders Union Local 165 and Mirage Casino-Hotel
Case Number: 2:2017cv00258
Filed: January 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation. Early Neutral Evaluation reset for 6/14/2017. Plaintiff must arrive at 8:30 a.m. Defendant must arrive at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Mirage Casino-Hotel, LLC without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 19 MOTION to Dismiss re 6 Amended Complaint. (Responses due by 4/10/2017.) Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation Regarding Service of Process and Timeline for Responsive Pleadings. Bartenders Union Local 165 and Mirage Casino-Hotel answer due 3/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houle v. Mirage Casino-Hotel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bartenders Union Local 165
Represented By: Kristin L Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirage Casino-Hotel
Represented By: Sandra Ketner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Houle
Represented By: Kristofer D. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?