Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust IV v. Reo Investment Advisors V LLC, et al
Plaintiff: PROF-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust IV
Defendant: El Dorado Neighborhood Second Homeowners Association, REO Investment Advisors V LLC and Terra West Collections Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00277
Filed: January 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 59 this court's prior order be, and the same hereby is, VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 45 Flying Frog Avenue Trust's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 46 plaintiff Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust V's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment and close the case accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 76 Stipulation; Re: 75 Motion to Amend/Correct, Responses due by 1/22/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER granting 46 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER granting 67 Motion for Leave to File Document; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Stipulation; Re: 67 Motion for Leave to File Document, Responses due by 11/2/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Stipulation; Re: 45 Motion for Summary Judgment Replies due by 6/13/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) Modified on 6/8/2018 (JM).
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 49 Stipulation; Re: 46 Motion for Summary Judgment, 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 5/28/2018. Responses due by 5/28/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 42 Stipulation; Motions due by 4/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Stipulation; Discovery due by 2/28/2018. Motions due by 3/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 35 Stipulation; ORDER granting 36 Stipulation; Discovery due by 1/29/2018. Motions due by 2/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust IV v. Reo Investment Advisors V LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Dorado Neighborhood Second Homeowners Association
Represented By: Ryan D Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REO Investment Advisors V LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra West Collections Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROF-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust IV
Represented By: John S. Dolembo
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?