Waggoner et al v. Children's Learning Adventure of Nevada, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jaime Waggoner and Mariacielo Waggoner
Defendant: Children's Learning Adventure USA and Children's Learning Adventure of Nevada, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00281
Filed: January 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion to Remand. This case is remanded back to the Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case No. A-16-748299-C, Dept. No. 12. The Clerk of Court is directed to DENY all motions without prejudice and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Certified copy of order and docket sheet sent to State Court - DC)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Motion to Remove Attorney Patrick J. Davis from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Alison M. Brasier substituted in place and stead of Tess Emily Johnson and Robert A Rabbat. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying 7 the parties' stipulated proposed discovery plan and scheduling order. The parties shall file a proposed discovery plan that complies with the Local Rules, no later than March 15, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waggoner et al v. Children's Learning Adventure of Nevada, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Children's Learning Adventure USA
Represented By: Patrick James Davis
Represented By: Jorge A Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Children's Learning Adventure of Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Patrick James Davis
Represented By: Jorge A Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Waggoner
Represented By: Tess Emily Johnson
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariacielo Waggoner
Represented By: Tess Emily Johnson
Represented By: Robert A Rabbat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?