HSBC Bank USA, National Association v. Saticy Bay, LLC Series 9538 Diamond Bridge et al
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Defendant: Ashley Ridge Association and Saticoy Bay, LLC Series 9538 Diamond Bridge
Case Number: 2:2017cv00289
Filed: January 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER that Defendant Saticoy Bay's 71 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Saticoy Bay on claim one, claim two, claim three, and claim five, finding that HSBC Bank's deed of trust was extinguished by the nonjudicial foreclosure sale.Defendant Ashley Ridge Association's 72 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant A shley Ridge Association on claim one and claim two, finding that HSBC Bank's deed of trust was extinguished by the nonjudicial foreclosure sale.Plaintiff HSBC Bank's 76 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. The pending 70 and 73 Motions to Dismiss are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that claim four is dismissed as it is not a stand-alone claim and the Clerk of Court shall close this case accordingly. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting 77 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 70 Renewed Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Responses due by 10/3/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 66 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney David A Markman terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER denying 16 Motion to Dismiss. The moving party shall have 21 days from the date of the Nevada Supreme Court's decision on the certified question to file a modified Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/22/2018.; Case stayed. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Denying as unnecessary 42 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re Written Discovery Requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) Modified to correct docket text on 7/14/2017 (SLD).
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. The Court again orders the parties to file no later than 5/9/2017 either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan or (2) a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that the parties file no later than 5/4/2017 a discovery plan or a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) to File Response to 16 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Responses due by 4/14/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSBC Bank USA, National Association v. Saticy Bay, LLC Series 9538 Diamond Bridge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Ridge Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saticoy Bay, LLC Series 9538 Diamond Bridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Represented By: Shadd A. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?