Miller v. Tropicana Las Vegas Resort & Casino
Plaintiff: Jerald Miller
Defendant: Tropicana Las Vegas Resort & Casino
Case Number: 2:2017cv00318
Filed: February 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER dismissing with prejudice this action per ECF No. 29 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 2:00 PM, 9/7/17, in Courtroom 3D. The status hearing will be vacated if a proposed stipulation and order for dismissal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 13 Defendant Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc.'s Request for Exemption for Insurance Carrier to Attend Early Neutral Evaluation Session is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Tropicana Las Vegas Resort & Casino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald Miller
Represented By: Patrick W Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tropicana Las Vegas Resort & Casino
Represented By: Dana B Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?