JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Antelope Homeowners' Association, Elizabeth Rocha, Horatio Rocha and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00326
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC against Elizabeth and Horatio Rocha. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER the court will disburse to Chase the $500 security bond plus interest. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Finance - JM)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 78 Motion for Default Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that SFR shall prepare and submit to the court a proposed judgment consistent with the foregoing within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 74 Stipulation of Dismissal and 75 Stipulation to Lift Stay. This Stipulation in no way affects SFR's cross-claim against Elizabeth Rocha or Horatio Rocha. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 12/14/2018 to correct typo (MMM).
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 72 Stipulation to Stay Entire Case Pending Settlement. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER that 35 the HOA's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 41 SFR's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that 65 Stipulation to Stay Discovery is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER that 61 Stipulation to Stay Discovery is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that no later than 10/27/17 either motions for default or dismissal papers must be filed for each of the claims and cross-claims against Defendants Elizabeth and Horatio Rocha. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Stipulation to Extend Time re 35 MOTION to Dismiss . ( Responses due by 9/29/2017.) Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that 21 Motion for demand for security of costs is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall post security in the amount of $500.00 within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Defendant's 11 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Plaintiff shall post security in the amount of $500.00 within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antelope Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horatio Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?