JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Zena F.N. Chee, Diamond Creek Community Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00328
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have an additional 60 days, or until 8/24/18, to either finalize their settlement agreement and file a stipulation to dismiss, or to file their Joint Pretrial Order. No further extensions will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties' request for an additional 90-day extension is DENIED. The parties will have an additional 45 days, or until 6/25/18, to file a stipulation to dismiss or a joint status report advising when the stipulation to dismiss will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 62 the Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED as moot. The parties shall have until 5/9/18 to file a stipulation for dismissal with prejudice or a joint status report indicating when the stipulation will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulation to Stay Entire Case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 47 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Sylvia O Semper terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 40 Motion for Service by Publication. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 41 SFR's Motion to Enlarge Time to Serve is GRANTED and the time for service is extended by an additional 60 days from the date of this order is entered to allow SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC (SFR) to effectuate service by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Edward D Boyack and Colli McKiever terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Diamond Creek Community Association without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 13 defendant's motion for demand for security of costs be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall post security in the amount of $500.00 within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 8 Motion to Extend Time for Service and Permit Service by Publication. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zena F.N. Chee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Creek Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?