U.S. Bank, National Association v. 4022 Emerald Wood Trust

Plaintiff: U.S.Bank National Association
Defendant: 4022 Emerald Wood Trust
Case Number: 2:2017cv00356
Filed: February 3, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order 40 ORDER granting 39 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 36 ORDER granting 35 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 3/7/2018. Motions due by 4/6/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER Granting 12 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Luis A. Ayon is substituted in place of the law firm Maier Gutierrez and Associates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, National Association v. 4022 Emerald Wood Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4022 Emerald Wood Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S.Bank National Association
Represented By: Rock K. Jung
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?