Guzman v. Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack et al

Plaintiff: Marie Antionette Guzman
Defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company, General Motors Company, LLC and Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack
Case Number: 2:2017cv00386
Filed: February 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 5/15/2018. Motions due by 6/14/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROTECTIVE ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that 29 GM LLC's Motion to Compel is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that 26 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Troy L. Vancil and approving Designation of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen for Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman v. Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: J. Christopher Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company, LLC
Represented By: Greg W. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack
Represented By: Josh Cole Aicklen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Antionette Guzman
Represented By: David J Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?