Brown v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Tony Ontia Brown
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Warden Baker
Case Number: 2:2017cv00387
Filed: February 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice; Certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. It is ordered that the motions for extension of time (ECF Nos. 23 , 24 , 26 , 27 , 31 , and 34 ) are all GRANTED nunc pro tunc as of their respective filing dates. It is further ordered that respondents' reply in support of their 28 motion to dismiss is due on or before 3/1/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the FPD shall have forty-five (45) days from the date of entry of this order to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall file a response to the petition (see order for details). F URTHER ORDERED that any additional state court record exhibits filed herein by either petitioner or respondents shall be filed with a separate index. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel, the FPD is appointed to represent petitioner and shall have 20 days from the date of entry of this order to file a notice of appearance; denying 4 Motion for Hearing. The Clerk shall file petition. Respondents shall have 20 days from the date on which the petition is served upon them to appear in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: pursuant to order - JM)
June 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying 6 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 7 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Updated Inmate Account or Payment of filing fees due 7/18/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: 2 Copies to P - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tony Ontia Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?