Tsumpes v. T3 Motion, Inc.
Plaintiff: William Tsumpes
Defendant: T3 Motion, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00393
Filed: February 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The clerk of court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report on or before 2/28/19. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court must update the docket to indicate that plaintiff William Tsumpes resides in Las Vegas, Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Main Document 35 replaced on 8/1/2018) (ADR).
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Mr. Tsumpes must file a notice with his current address with the court by 7/13/18. If Mr. Tsumpes does not update his address by that date, the court will recommend dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report on or before 6/22/18. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that by 3/29/18, Tsumpes must file a written notice stating whether he intends to represent himself in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Motion to Withdraw Attorneys John S Delikanakis and Adam Q. Tully for Plaintiff William Tsumpes. Plaintiff must file a written notice stating whether he intends to represent himself in this case by 2/20/2018. The clerk of court must update the docket sheet with Plaintiff's last known address (see Order for address). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 9 the defendant's motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report regarding the bankruptcy proceedings on or before 4/10/18, and every 180 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if 9 the motion to dismiss or, alternatively, to transfer is denied, the parties must meet and confer and file a stipulated discovery plan within 21 days of the date of the order on the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation re 9 MOTION to Dismiss re 1 Complaint. (Replies due by 5/19/2017.) Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Melissa Ingleby and Leah A. Martin terminated. Attorney John S. Delikanakis added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tsumpes v. T3 Motion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T3 Motion, Inc.
Represented By: Allison R. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Tsumpes
Represented By: Melissa Ingleby
Represented By: Leah A. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?