Hales v. Grant & Weber, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Daniel S. Hales
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware, Chase Bank, National Association, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, First National Bank of Omaha and Grant & Weber, Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv00414
Filed: February 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Re: 69 Notice of Settlement. The status hearing scheduled for 4/30/2018 is VACATED. Plaintiff and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. must file a proposed stipulation and order for dismissal on or before 7/2/2018. All pending discovery deadlines are VACATED. Status Hearing set for 7/3/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER that the Status Hearing is rescheduled to 4/30/2018 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach due to a conflict on the Court's calendar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 57 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant Chase Bank, National Association. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hales v. Grant & Weber, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware
Represented By: J. Christopher Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Lindsay C Demaree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: John M. Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Omaha
Represented By: Stephen Randall Kopolow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant & Weber, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel S. Hales
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Allison R. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?