Benson v. State of Nevada et al
Defendant: City of Las Vegas, Clark County Sheriff Department, County of Clark, Ewing Brothers Towing Company, Fox 5 News, Douglas Gillespie, Jason Gunnell, S. Jung, D. King, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police, Las Vegas Review Journal, Michael Madland, Kenneth Mead, Eli Segall, State of Nevada, United States Department of the Treasury, United States Federal Bureau of Investigations, United States Inc and B. Vanoosbree
Claimant: Thomas Benson
Case Number: 2:2017cv00447
Filed: February 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 28, 34, 21, 24, 29, 31, 57) are GRANTED, and Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 11, 13, 53, 55) are DENIED AS MOOT; Any other outstanding motions are DENIED without prejudice as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that LVRJ and Segall's Special Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 63) is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No. 62) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff� 39;s Motion for Jury Trial (ECF No. 112) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that LVRJ and Segall's Motion to Strike (ECF No. 116) Motion (ECF No. 113) and Motion to Strike (ECF No. 119) Motion (ECF No. 118) are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to STRIKE ECF No. 113 and ECF No. 118. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/30/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 82 Motion; ORDER adopting 134 Report and Recommendation; FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Benson is declared a vexatious litigant subject to pre-screening of future complaints he seeks to file in this District. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/13/2017. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Recommending that Mr. Benson be declared a vexatious litigant re 82 Motion. Objections to R&R due by 11/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting 102 Motion to Strike and 127 Motion to Strike re 132 Notice (Other), 121 Notice (Other), 98 Response to Motion. PLAINTIFF SHALL REFRAIN FROM FILING FRIVOLOUS AND FALSE DOCUMENTS IN THIS CASE. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER re 82 Motion. The Court declines to hear the motion to declare Plaintiff vexatious on an emergency basis. As such, that motion will be briefed according to the default schedule in the local rules, and will be decided in the ordinary course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Staying deadline to file a discovery plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 41 Motion to Quash service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that 27 Motion to Strike is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Thomas Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Represented By: Elias P. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Sheriff Department
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ewing Brothers Towing Company
Represented By: Peter M. Angulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox 5 News
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Gillespie
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Gunnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Review Journal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Madland
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Mead
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Segall
Represented By: Margaret A McLetchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Federal Bureau of Investigations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Vanoosbree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?