Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Homeowner Association Services, Inc., Northbrook Homeowners Association, Inc. and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00457
Filed: February 10, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2018 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion to Lift Stay of Case; Motions due within 45 days after entry of this order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 25, 2018 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/25/2018.; Case stayed. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 9, 2018 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Stipulation; Re: 42 Motion for Summary Judgment, 43 Motion for Summary Judgment, 44 Motion for Summary Judgment, Responses due by 1/19/2018. Replies due by 2/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 20, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 30 Motion for Service by Publication. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 31 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED and the time for service is extended by an additional 60 days from the date of this order is entered to allow SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC (SFR) to effectuate service by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Rock K. Jung
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeowner Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northbrook Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?