Banerjee et al v. Continental Incorporated, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Adrish Banerjee and Yan He
Defendant: Continental Incorporated, Inc. and Leapers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00466
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 93 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Re: 89 Order. Settlement documents deadline extended 7 days. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER. Stipulation of Dismissal due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Stipulation to Dismiss or Status Report due by 6/14/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 68 Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss or a report on the status of settlement by March 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 JUDGMENT on Attorney's Fees in favor of defendants Continental Incorporated, Inc. and Leapers, Inc. and against plaintiffs Adrish Banerjee and Yan He in the amount of $49,554.72 ($48,617.50 in attorneys fees and $937.22 in costs). Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting in part 60 Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees. The clerk of court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of defendant Continental Incorporated, Inc. and Leapers, Inc. and against plaintiffs Adrish Banerjee and Yan He in the amount of $49,554.72 ($48,617.50 in attorneys fees and $937.22 in costs). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 70 Stipulation re: 68 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 7/19/2018. Replies due by 7/30/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 60 Motion for Attorney Fees. Responses due by 3/16/2018. Defendants' time to file their reply will remain as March 20, 2018. The status hearing currently set for March 21, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. shall remain on the Court's calendar. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDERED that Defendants shall file their motion for attorney's fees no later than February 27, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition no later than March 13, 2018 and Defendants shall file their Reply no later than March 20, 2018.FURTHE R ORDERED that discovery is stayed pending the resolution of the motion for award of attorney's fees and the possible retention of new counsel by Plaintiffs. This matter is set for a status conference regarding the pending motions to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiffs (ECF Nos. 53 , 55 ) on March 21, 2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3A. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDERED that the Court's Order (ECF No. 54 ) granting Jeffrey Pitegoff's Motion to Withdraw is withdrawn. Jeffrey Pitegoff's Motion to Withdraw (ECF No. 53 ) is set for hearing on Tuesday, February 13, 2018 at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A. Defendants shall file their response to Jeffrey Pitegoff's Motion to Withdraw no later than Friday, February 9, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that 8 Motion to Dismiss (anti-SLAPP) is GRANTED and 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED in part. The plaintiffs only remaining claim is under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. FURTHER ORDERED that 41 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority and 50 Motion for Leave to Supplement are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall unseal ECF No. 23 . Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Stipulation for Status Conference. Status Conference set for 1/5/2018 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 22 Motion to File Under Seal. Defendants have until 7/14/2017 to file a motion to seal Plaintiffs' Opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that the clerk shall unseal 22 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines re 7 , 8 MOTIONS to Dismiss . (Responses due by 6/27/2017., Replies due by 7/11/2017.) Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banerjee et al v. Continental Incorporated, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrish Banerjee
Represented By: Jeffrey I Pitegoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yan He
Represented By: Jeffrey I Pitegoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Incorporated, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leapers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?