Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al v. Newport Cove Condominium Unit Owners' Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Defendant: Daly Management Corporation, Hampton & Hampton Collections, LLC, Newport Cove Condominium Unit Owners' Association, Inc. and RBBE Real Estate Investments, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00474
Filed: February 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying 76 Motion to Enforce; vacating 81 Order, vacating 80 Order, Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re 76 Motion. IT IS ORDERED that K&B shall, within five (5) days from the date of this order, file a supplemental exhibit containing itemized billing statements for its client, Daly Management Corporation, for the courts review. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER. This Order shall constitute notice to all interested parties that the court will adjudicate, upon expiration of five (5) days following the date of this order, K&B's 76 Motion to Enforce. A response to the motion may be filed any time within the next five (5) days for the court's consideration. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 58 First Motion for Summary Judgment. The HOA's 23 Motion to Dismiss is Denied. Plaintiff's 65 Second Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied as moot. The HOA's 66 Motion for Summary Judgm ent is Denied as moot. Plaintiffs' 70 Stipulation for Extension of Time is Denied as moot. Plaintiffs shall prepare a proposed judgment consistent with this order and submit it to the court within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 62 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. Nationstar's Replies due by 2/9/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation to Extend Discovery (First Request) as to Defendant Daily Management Corporation only. Discovery due by 1/30/2018. Motions due by 2/12/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re 38 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Case-Management Conference set for 8/18/2017 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation to Set Aside 22 Clerk's Entry of Default. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 23 First MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/15/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al v. Newport Cove Condominium Unit Owners' Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daly Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampton & Hampton Collections, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport Cove Condominium Unit Owners' Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBBE Real Estate Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Vatana Lay
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Vatana Lay
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?