The Bank of New York Mellon v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00479
Filed: February 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying SFR's 33 Motion to Dismiss and Denying Shadow Crossings' 37 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that 27 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment is GRANTED. The Court will deny in part and grant in part 15 SFR's Motion to Dismiss, vacate the court's order granting SFR's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 25 ), and vacate the cler k's judgment in favor of SFR (ECF No. 26 ). The court will dismiss only BNYM's declaratory relief claim. FURTHER ORDERED that the HOA be joined as a defendant to the instant action. Plaintiff is instructed to serve the HOA in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The clerk is instructed to reopen the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting Defendant's 15 Motion to Dismiss. The 1 Complaint is Dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 20 Status Report seeking a stay of discovery. The Court declines to order an indefinite stay of discovery pending a ruling on that motion to dismiss, but will instead extend the deadline for the parties to file a joint proposed discovery plan to August 24, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that the parties are to file no later than 7/21/2017 either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan or (2) a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying 12 Stipulation to Stay Litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Defendant's 9 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Plaintiff shall post security in the amount of $500.00 within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?