TransFirst Group Inc et al v. Magliarditi et al
Plaintiff: Payment Resources International, LLC, TransFirst Group Inc and TransFirst Third Party Sales
Defendant: ATM Enterprises LLC, Chazzlive.com LLC, DFM Holdings LLP, DFM Holdings Ltd, DFM Holdings, LP, DII Capital Inc, DII Properties LLC, DJM Irrevocable Trust, FRM Trust, Fane Trust, Dominic J Magliarditi, Francine Magliarditi, Magliarditi Ltd and Spartan Payment Solutions LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00487
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3545 Action to Recovery Money
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting 281 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 279 Motion, 278 Order. Defendants formerly represented by the law firm of Cook & Kelesis, LTD, other than Francine Magliarditi, must retain counsel to proceed with their defense (see order for details). Status Hearing reset for 7/1/2020 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER Re: 255 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER Granting 241 Motion to Extend Time Re: 240 Motion to Refer Case to the Bankruptcy Court. Responses due by 11/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting 237 Stipulation re Claims; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 234 Stipulation Re Sale of Property; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending further proceedings in Dominic Magliarditi's bankruptcy case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the contempt proceedings against defendant Francine Magliarditi are temporarily STAYED and the cont empt hearing set for 8/22/18 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 195 defendant Francine Magliarditi's motion for clarification is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER that 221 Motion to Continue is granted. The July 20, 2018 show cause hearing and status conference is vacated and rescheduled for august 8, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. FURTHER ORDERED that the deadlines contained in the Scheduling Order (ECF No. [ 169]) are stayed pending further order of the court. FURTHER ORDERED that TransFirst may conduct limited discovery related to the contempt hearing as enumerated in this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER Granting 211 Motion for Leave to Employ Counsel, Directing Receiver to File a Report, and Ordering Briefs Regarding the Impact of the Automatic Stay. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting 208 Stipulation; Re: 195 Motion. Responses due by 6/29/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Re: 194 Motion, Responses due by 6/11/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting 192 Motion to Supplement 109 Preliminary Injunction. The show cause hearing will be held on Monday, July 2, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. in courtroom 6C in Las Vegas. Francine Magliarditi shall appear in person for the hearing. TransFirst shall provide the name and resume of the proposed limited purpose receiver (see order for details). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting 189 Motion for Supplement to Preliminary Injunction; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 180 , 184 the defendants' motions to seal are GRANTED. The Appendices 181 , 184 shall remain filed under seal. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER Re: 173 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Responses due by 5/24/2018. Replies due by 5/29/2018. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting in part 89 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER granting in part 90 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER denying 94 Motion for More Definite Statement; ORDER denying 95 Motion to Strike; ORDER denying 96 Motion for More Definite Statement; ORDER denying 97 Motion to Strike; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting 148 Motion to Seal Exhibits L and P in camera submission. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER Certifying Questions to the Supreme Court of Nevada. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc Docs 109, 145: NV Supreme Court - JM)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Granting 6 Ex Parte Motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting Plaintiff's oral motion for a temporary restraining order. Hearing for 6 Ex Parte Motion set for 4/10/2017 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. The plaintiffs shall ensure that the cash bond in the amou nt of $25,000 that was posted in Texas is transferred to the Clerk of Court for the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. The previously posted bond shall serve as security in the interim. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/28/2017 nunc pro tunc to 1:58 p.m. on 3/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 45 Motion to Extend Time. Dominic J Magliarditi answer due 4/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re 11 Amended Complaint. Defendants Francine Magliarditi; FRM Trust; DJM Irrevocable Trust; Fane Trust; ATM Enterprises, LLC; DII Capital, Inc.; DFM Holdings, Ltd., DFM Holdings, LP; and DII Properties, LLC shall have two (2) weeks from March 18, 2017 to answer, move, or otherwise respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying 14 Motion to Dismiss filed and 18 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Francine Magliarditi, DFM Holdings, Ltd., and DFM Holdings, LP for lack of personal jurisdiction, the court hereby transfers thi s action insofar as it relates to these Defendants to the District Court for the District of Nevada pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1631. The court transfers this action as it relates to Defendants Mr. Magliarditi, the Trust Defendants, and the Shell Company Defendants to the District Court for the District of Nevada pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/15/2017) (epm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/16/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TransFirst Group Inc et al v. Magliarditi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATM Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Mark B Bailus
Represented By: Melissa J Swindle
Represented By: Robert C Wiegand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chazzlive.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFM Holdings LLP
Represented By: Mark B Bailus
Represented By: Melissa J Swindle
Represented By: Robert C Wiegand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFM Holdings Ltd
Represented By: Mark B Bailus
Represented By: Melissa J Swindle
Represented By: Robert C Wiegand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFM Holdings, LP
Represented By: Mark B Bailus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DII Capital Inc
Represented By: Mark B Bailus
Represented By: Melissa J Swindle
Represented By: Robert C Wiegand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DII Properties LLC
Represented By: Mark B Bailus
Represented By: Melissa J Swindle
Represented By: Robert C Wiegand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJM Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Mark B Bailus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRM Trust
Represented By: Mark B Bailus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fane Trust
Represented By: Mark B Bailus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic J Magliarditi
Represented By: Brian N. Hail
Represented By: Dominic J Magliarditi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francine Magliarditi
Represented By: Mark B Bailus
Represented By: Melissa J Swindle
Represented By: Robert C Wiegand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magliarditi Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartan Payment Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payment Resources International, LLC
Represented By: Tyler J Bexley
Represented By: Peter D. Marketos
Represented By: Adam Cooper Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TransFirst Group Inc
Represented By: Tyler J Bexley
Represented By: Peter D. Marketos
Represented By: Adam Cooper Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TransFirst Third Party Sales
Represented By: Tyler J Bexley
Represented By: Peter D. Marketos
Represented By: Adam Cooper Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?