Foskaris v. Experian Information Solutions, INC
Plaintiff: Thomsas Foskaris
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00506
Filed: February 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER that 39 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc,'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that all other outstanding motions are DENIED as moot.FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court enter JUDGMENT for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc and against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 94 Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline. Motions due by 3/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting 87 Stipulation to Continue Hearing re: 64 Motion to Extend Case Deadlines and 65 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time. Motion Hearing continued to 3/6/2018 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 37 Stipulation for Amended Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 11 Stipulation re Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foskaris v. Experian Information Solutions, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomsas Foskaris
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?