Zimmerman v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00529
Filed: February 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. The clerk is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Denying Defendant-Intervenor's 40 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by 7/10/2017 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) Modified to correct due date of Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order on 6/29/2017 (SLD).
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall unseal the Omnibus Order regarding the refiling of Plaintiff's certificate of interested parties in each of the above-listed cases. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall not file his amended certificates of interested parties under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that this case is transferred to Chief Judge Gloria Navarro and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. All future filings for this case must bear case number 2:17-cv-00529-GMN-GWF. Plaintiff must file a copy of this Order in any future ADA case he files in this district. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Represented By: Whitney C Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?