Zimmerman v. Snowed Inn, LLC
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Defendant: Snowed Inn, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00563
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action are dismissed with prejudice. The clerk of court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff chooses to do so, Plaintiff shall file new Amended Complaint in this action within t hirty (30) days of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that stays entered is LIFTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file Proposed Discovery Plans/Scheduling Order in the case within sixty (60) days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 22 Intervenor's Motion to Consolidate Cases. All consolidated briefings shall be filed in Case No. 2:17-cv-00304-GMN-GWF. All pending motions to dismiss are denied without prejudice with leave to join in the consolidated briefing. Intervenor shall have until 4/18/2018 to file its consolidated motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on 31 the parties' Stipulated Motion and Order to Stay Proceedings is granted, in part, as described. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OMNIBUS ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall unseal the Omnibus Order regarding the refiling of Plaintiffs certificate of interested parties in each of the above-listed cases. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall not file his amended certificates of interested parties under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that this case is transferred to Chief Judge Gloria Navarro and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. All future filings for this case must bear case number 2:17-cv-00563-GMN-GWF. Plaintiff must file a copy of this Order in any future ADA case he files in this district. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. Snowed Inn, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snowed Inn, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Represented By: Whitney C Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?