Ortiz v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
702) 366-7078 (fax: Edgar Ortiz
Case Number: 2:2017cv00580
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 9 Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company's motion to dismiss or, alternatively, to transfer venue is GRANTED in part: this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 19 the parties' Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is denied without prejudice. The parties shall submit a revised Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order no later than 7/19/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Amend Deadline for Parties to Submit Initial Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (First Request). Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than March 24, 2017. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 03/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 366-7078 (fax: Edgar Ortiz
Represented By: Cliff W. Marcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?