Lee v. Venetian Casino Resort, LLC
Plaintiff: Sam Lee
Defendant: Venetian Casino Resort, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00603
Filed: February 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 15 defendant Venetian Resort Casino, LLC's motion is GRANTED. Judgment shall be entered for Venetian against Lee on the Title VII claim. I decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status hearing scheduled for 10/18/17 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 10:00 AM, 2/28/18, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on 33 the Motion to Extend Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Dates is scheduled for 10:00 AM, 10/18/17, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. The Court hereby DISCHARGES 27 the order to show cause regarding sealing,and INSTRUCTS the Clerk's Office to maintain as sealed the filing at Docket No. 26 . The Court further cautions Defendant and its counsel that papers filed under seal must be accompanied by a proper motion for leave to file those documents under seal. See Local Rule IA 10-5(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation to Extend Time re 15 MOTION to Dismiss re: 1 Complaint. ( Replies due by 4/21/2017.) Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation. ( Early Neutral Evaluation reset for 6/5/2017 09:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 7 STIPULATION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Venetian Casino Resort, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Lee
Represented By: Kirk T Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venetian Casino Resort, LLC
Represented By: Veronica Arechederra-Hall
Represented By: Cayla Witty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?