Hawkins Marital Trust v. Peterson et al
Plaintiff: Hawkins Marital Trust
Defendant: Randolph Peterson and Teri Peterson
Case Number: 2:2017cv00610
Filed: February 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 7 the Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 7 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 3/31/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins Marital Trust v. Peterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawkins Marital Trust
Represented By: Frank A Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph Peterson
Represented By: Darrell D. Dennis
Represented By: Adam J Pernsteiner
Represented By: Jake R. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Peterson
Represented By: Darrell D. Dennis
Represented By: Adam J Pernsteiner
Represented By: Jake R. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?