Min v. Boyd Gaming Corporation et al
Plaintiff: K Mya Mya Min
Defendant: Boyd Gaming Corporation and Neal Jay Lipman
Case Number: 2:2017cv00625
Filed: February 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation to Vacate the Deadline for Submission of ENE Statment and Vacate the ENE Session. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Submission of ENE Statements. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 15 the Substitution of Attorney is GRANTED. Charles M. Vlasic, III of CV3 Legal is substituted in the place of Kerry Elizabeth Kleiman of Reid Rubinstein & Bogatz for Defendant Neal Jay Lipman, subject to the provisions of LR IA 11-6(c) and (d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 7 Stipulation to Amend Case Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Min v. Boyd Gaming Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd Gaming Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal Jay Lipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K Mya Mya Min
Represented By: Danielle J. Barraza
Represented By: Joseph A. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?