Logay v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Donald S Logay
Defendant: Equifax Inc, Experian Information Services, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00642
Filed: March 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Stipulation of Dismissal; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 44 Settlement Notice. Stipulation to Dismiss or Joint Status Report due by 10/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Compel.; granting 46 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 41 Stipulation to Continue Hearing re 26 MOTION to Compel Discovery. ( Motion Hearing reset for 8/21/2017 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims against Trans Union LLC are DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logay v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Services, Inc.
Represented By: Charles E Gianelloni
Represented By: Bob L. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.
Represented By: Wing Yan Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald S Logay
Represented By: Vernon Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?