Chocolate Magic Las Vegas, LLC v. Ford, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Chocolate Magic Las Vegas, LLC
Defendant: Blair Elliot Ford, Jr., Alice Kelley, Norman Vida and Cindy Wix-Ingling
Counter Defendant: Douglas Birrell, Chocolate Magic Las Vegas, LLC and Dino Dicienzo
Counter Claimant: Cindy Wix-Ingling
Case Number: 2:2017cv00690
Filed: March 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that on or before March 8, 2019, the remaining parties shall file a proposed joint pretrial order, dismissal papers, or a status report on what, if anything, remains of this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 95 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice re Blair Elliot Ford, Jr. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting 93 First Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice re Cindy Wix-Ingling. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Denying 72 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and Granting in part 68 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting 85 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 82 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Replies due by 5/10/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 62 Motion to Extend Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Blair Elliot Ford, Jr. answer due 2/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 21 defendant Ford's motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation re 14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 21 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to file, no later than 6/1/2017, a supplement. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file, no later than 5/25/2017, either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan; or (2) a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 21 Motion to Dismiss (Second Request). Responses due by 5/23/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 21 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 5/15/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Blair Ford to Respond to 1 Complaint (First Request). Answer due 4/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chocolate Magic Las Vegas, LLC v. Ford, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Douglas Birrell
Represented By: John E. Bragonje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Chocolate Magic Las Vegas, LLC
Represented By: John E. Bragonje
Represented By: Howard E. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Dino Dicienzo
Represented By: John E. Bragonje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chocolate Magic Las Vegas, LLC
Represented By: John E. Bragonje
Represented By: Howard E. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair Elliot Ford, Jr.
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Kaine M. Messer
Represented By: Jeff Martin Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Vida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Wix-Ingling
Represented By: Ines Olevic-Saleh
Represented By: Jesse M. Sbaih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Cindy Wix-Ingling
Represented By: Ines Olevic-Saleh
Represented By: Jesse M. Sbaih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?