U.S. Bank National Association v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Aileen Elacio, Amor Elacio, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Setona Homeowners' Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv00708
Filed: March 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff and defendant Setona Homeowners' Association shall have 30 days to either file a stipulation to dismiss with prejudice, or the joint pretrial order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff and defendant Setona shall have until 10/29/18 to either file a stipulation to dismiss with prejudice, or a joint status report advising when the stipulation to dismiss will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 36 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Denying 40 Motion to Dismiss; Denying 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 46 Motion for Relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report to the court within thirty (30) days of the date of this order.Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report to the court within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 67 Stipulation to Stay Litigation and Discovery. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 60 STIPULATION and Order for Disclaimer of Interest and Dismissal of Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 35 the Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED 38 , 39 the Countermotions to Stay Discovery or to Allow Case to Proceed Without Restriction is DENIED with respect to the request to stay discovery, and GRANTED with respect to the request to proceed without restriction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Plaintiff shall post security in the amount of $500.00 within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Finance - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aileen Elacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amor Elacio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Setona Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Represented By: Preston Mathews
Represented By: Katie M. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?