ME2 Productions, Inc. v. John and Jane Does

Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2017cv00722
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Quash.; denying 12 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 10, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the recipients of the subpoenas not to provide the subpoenaed information pending resolution of the order to show cause. Plaintiff is further ORDERED to immediately serve a copy of this order on the recipients of the subpoenas, and to file a proof of service so indicating by noon on 5/12/2017 Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 2, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 10 Notice (Other). The court construes the letter as a motion to quash. The Clerk's Office is Instructed to update the docket accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 17, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Plaintiff to file Amended Complaint by 6/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ME2 Productions, Inc. v. John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?