ME2 Productions, Inc. v. John and Jane Does

Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2017cv00724
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that no later than 6/29/2017 Plaintiff is to either (1) file a notice of corrected image making clear in each of its cases that the nonappearing Defendants were actually served with the report and recommendation issued in this case or (2) serve the non-appearing Defendants in each of Plaintiff's cases with the report and recommendation issued in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 13, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that all Defendants except Mikiyas Bayu be SEVERED and DISMISSED without prejudice to the filing of a new case concurrently with the payment of the required filing fee. The Court ORDERS that any outstanding subpoenas is sued in this case shall be QUASHED. Plaintiff is to promptly serve a copy of this order on the recipients of any outstanding subpoenas and shall file a proof of service by 6/20/2017. Plaintiff is to promptly serve a copy of this order and report and recommendation on any defendant who has not yet appeared and shall file a proof of service by 6/20/2017. Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 18, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court again ORDERS Plaintiff to serve a copy of the Court's 9 Order on the recipients of the subpoenas (to the extent that service was not previously completed), and to file a proof of service by noon on 5/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 10, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court orders the recipients of the subpoenas not to provide the subpoenaed information pending resolution of the order to show cause. Plaintiff is to immediately serve a copy of this order on the recipients of the subpoenas and to file a proof of service by noon on 5/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ME2 Productions, Inc. v. John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?