Zimmerman v. Office Depot, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00815
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (Fifth Request). Office Depot, Inc. answer due 9/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation to Extend Time re 1 Complaint (Third Request). Office Depot, Inc. answer due 7/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Office Depot, Inc. answer due 5/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall unseal the Omnibus Order regarding the refiling of Plaintiff's certificate of interested parties in each of the above-listed cases. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall not file his amended certificates of interested parties under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Represented By: Whitney C Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?