Zimmerman v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2017cv00833
Filed: March 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 25 Intervenor's Motion to Consolidate Cases. All consolidated briefings shall be filed in Case No. 2:17-cv-00304-GMN-GWF. All pending motions to dismiss are denied without prejudice with l eave to join in the consolidated briefing. Intervenor shall have until 4/18/2018 to file its consolidated motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 33 on the parties' Stipulated Motion and Order to Stay Proceedings and Extend Discovery Deadlines is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall strike 28 Plaintiff's amended complaint without prejudice to Plaintiff filing an amended complaint with leave of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than 10/10/17 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation to Extend Time. Starbucks Corporation answer due 8/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation to Extend Time. Starbucks Corporation answer due 7/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OMNIBUS ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall unseal the Omnibus Order regarding the refiling of Plaintiffs certificate of interested parties in each of the above-listed cases. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall not file his amended certificates of interested parties under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Represented By: Whitney C Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?