Zimmerman v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2017cv00834
Filed: March 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Intervenor's 21 Motion to Consolidate Cases. All consolidated briefings shall be filed in Case No. 2:17-cv-00304-GMN-GWF. All pending motions to dismiss are denied without prejudice with leave to join in the consolidated briefing. Intervenor shall have until 4/18/2018 to file its consolidated motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/26/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall strike Plaintiff's 24 Amended Complaint without prejudice to Plaintiff filing an Amended Complaint with leave of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the parties file a Stipulated Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 10/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall unseal 6 the Order regarding therefiling of Plaintiff's certificate of interested parties. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall not file his amended certificates of interested parties under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Represented By: Whitney C Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?