Kennedy et al v. Las Vegas Sands Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Sean Kennedy, Andrew Snider, Christopher Ward, Randall Weston and Ronald Williamson
Defendant: Interface Operations LLC, Las Vegas Sands Corp., Las Vegas Sands, LLC and Sands Aviation, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00880
Filed: March 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER Granting 219 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 216 Order (Fourth Request). Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Granting 213 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 212 Order (Second Request). Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER Granting 210 Stipulation to Extend Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Granting 202 , 203 Motions to Withdraw as Attorney. Anthony L. Martin and Dana B Salmonson withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a telephonic status hearing is scheduled for 10:00 AM, 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Granting 187 Stipulation to Continue Hearing re 181 Motion for Hearing Before Magistrate Judge (First Request). Status Conference reset for 7/12/2019 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 163 - 165 Defendants' previous Motions to Seal and their attachments be unsealed. IT IS ORDERED that 178 , 179 Defendants' Motions for Leave to File Certain Exhibits under Seal or Redacted are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as outlined.See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER re 181 Motion for Hearing. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 10:00 AM, 7/1/2019, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 124 defendants' first motion in limine be, and the same hereby is, DENIED, without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 125 defendants' second motion in limine be, and the sam e hereby is, DENIED, without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 127 plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 123 the court's 10/23/2018, order be, and the same hereb y is, VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 114 plaintiffs' motion to strike be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 144 defendants' first motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED.I T IS FURTHER ORDERED that 145 defendants' second motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 146 defendants' third motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, STRICKEN. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER Denying without prejudice 163 , 164 , 165 Motions to Seal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 155 , 157 , 158 , 161 the appendices will remain temporarily sealed until 5/8/2019. If defendants have not filed a motion to seal as described above,on or before 5/9/2019, the appendices must be unsealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER Granting 172 Errata to 140 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Granting 129 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 125 Motion (First Request). Responses due by 11/27/2018. Replies due by 12/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Granting 116 Stipulation re Discovery Conference re 109 Order (First Request). Discovery Hearing reset for 8/22/2018 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on or before 8/7/2018, defendants must deliver to plaintiffs copies of pages 1, 8 and 9 of the 14 page VanAllen Corporate Aviation Benchmarking report, as described. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before 8/7/20 18, any additional documents not yet produced for in camera review, which relate to the three pages ordered produced, must be delivered to chambers for in camera inspection. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 107 Stipulation; granting 108 Stipulation; Plaintiffs and Defendants shall have until August 6, 2018 to file a memorandum to the Court. Discovery Hearing set for 8/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) Modified on 7/31/2018 (JM).
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 95 Defendants' Emergency Motion for Protective Order, Alternatively to Quash, Plaintiffs' Subpoena Issued to Non-Party The VanAllen Group, Inc. will be briefed in the ordinary course. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that compliance with Plaintiffs' subpoena duces tecum is stayed pending resolution of Defendant's motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to 82 Plaintiffs' First Emergency Motion to Compel Defendant Sands Aviation's Responses to Written Discovery and 83 Second Emergency Motion to Compel must be filed on or before 6/5/2018 . Any reply in support must be filed on or before 6/12/2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing is scheduled for 10:00 AM, 6/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to 71 Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel Responses to Written Discovery must be filed on or before 4/24/2018. Any reply in support of 71 Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel Response s to Written Discovery must be filed on or before 5/1/2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on 71 Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel Responses to Written Discovery is scheduled for 2:00 PM, 5/7/2018, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 56 Defendants' Motion to Strike is GRANTED with respect to Paragraphs 158-183 and 193-204. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 56 Defendants' Motion to Strike is DENIED with respect to Paragraphs 7, 124, 127, 136, 138-140, 149-157, 184-192, and 223-226. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 57 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 56 Motion to Strike (First Request). Responses due by 9/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 49 plaintiffs' motion to amend/correct complaint be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file, within seven (7) days from the entry of this order, a first amended c omplaint identical to that attached to their 49 -2 motion to amend.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 20 defendant's motion to strike be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on 20 defendant's motion to strike set for 8/11/2017, at 2:00 p.m. be, and the same hereby is, VACATED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 47 Stipulation to Continue Hearing (First Request) on Defendants' 20 MOTION to Strike re 1 Complaint. Motion Hearing reset for 8/11/2017 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 18 Interface's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE consistent with the foregoing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 19 Sands' motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE consistent with the foregoing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 21 the parties' stipulation to extend time be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED nunc pro tunc to 5/17/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 20 Motion to Strike (Second Request). Responses due by 6/14/2017. Replies due by 6/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 19 Motion to Dismiss (Second Request). Responses due by 6/14/2017. Replies due by 6/28/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 20 Motion to Strike (First Request). Responses due by 5/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Interface Operations LLC answer due 5/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy et al v. Las Vegas Sands Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interface Operations LLC
Represented By: Dominica C. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Sands Corp.
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Represented By: Dana B Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Sands, LLC
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Represented By: Dana B Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sands Aviation, LLC
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Represented By: Dana B Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Kennedy
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Snider
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ward
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Weston
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Williamson
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?