Zimmerman v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00973
Filed: April 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that t this action is dismissed with prejudice. The clerk of court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that stay entered is hereby LIFTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file Proposed Discovery Plans/Scheduling Order within sixty (60) days of this Order. Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 24 Intervenor's Motion to Consolidate Cases. All consolidated briefings shall be filed in Case No. 2:17-cv-00304-GMN-GWF. All pending motions to dismiss are denied without prejudice with leave to join in the consolidated briefing. Intervenor shall have until 4/18/2018 to file its consolidated motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall strike 26 Plaintiff's amended complaint without prejudice to Plaintiff filing an amended complaint with leave of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than 7/10/2017 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 4/28/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall TRANSFER this case to Chief District Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge George W. Foley, Jr. for all further proceedings. All future filings in this action shall reference Case No. 2:17-cv-00973-GMN-GWF. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Chilleen
Represented By: Dalton L. Hooks
Represented By: Gregory F. Hurley
Represented By: Mari K Schaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Represented By: Whitney C Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?