Zimmerman v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00974
Filed: April 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that this action is Dismissed with prejudice. The clerk of court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Intervenor's 58 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Complaints in the above-captioned actions are DISMISSED without prejudice. Intervenor's Motion as it pertains to Plaintiff's 55 Amended Complaint in 2:17-0304-GMN- GWF is GRANTED.Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to File an Amended Complaint in Case Nos. 2:17- cv-0560-GMN-GWF (ECF No. 31); 2:17-cv-0563-GMN-GWF (ECF No. 23); and 2:17- cv-0595-GMN-GWF (ECF No. 35), are DENIED without prejudice. Amended Compla int deadline: due within 30 days of this Order.The stays entered in Case Nos. 2:17-cv-0304-GMN-GWF; 2:17-cv-0307-GMN-GWF; 2:17-cv-0563-GMN-GWF; 2:17-cv-0595-GMN-GWF; 2:17-cv-0973-GMN-GWF; 2:17-cv-0974-GMN- GWF; 2:17-cv-1194-GMN-GWF; and 2:17-cv-13 58-GMN-GWF are LIFTED.The parties shall file Proposed Discovery Plans/Scheduling Orders in the above- captioned cases within 60 days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Intervenor's 25 Motion to Consolidate Cases. All consolidated briefings shall be filed in Case No. 2:17-cv-00304-GMN-GWF. All pending motions to dismiss are denied without prejudice with leav e to join in the consolidated briefing. Intervenor shall have until 4/18/2018 to file its consolidated motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/26/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings in this case until after the court in Zimmerman v. GJS Group rules on the State of Nevada's Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall strike Plaintiff's 27 Amended Complaint without prejudice to Plaintiff filing an Amended Complaint with leave of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by 7/10/2017 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Chilleen
Represented By: Dalton L. Hooks
Represented By: Gregory F. Hurley
Represented By: Mari K Schaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Represented By: Whitney C Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?