Mueller v. Desert Palace, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scott Mueller
Defendant: LVMPD Officer Karl Atkinson, Desert Palace, Inc., LVMPD Officer Shawn Ford, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Touch LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00999
Filed: April 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 69 Notice of Settlement. The parties are to file dismissal papers by 5/14/2018. Any other deadlines are VACATED. The pending 64 Motion for Settlement Conference is DENIED as moot. The notice indicates that the parties also settled 2:17-cv-00168-NJK. The parties to that action shall file a notice of settlement in that case by 3/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Re: 64 Motion and 66 Stipulation. The Court sets a Telephonic Hearing for 3/14/2018 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Counsel and Mr. Mueller shall appear telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Re: 59 Status Report. Plaintiff is to contact Defendants' attorneys by 2/20/2018 to confer on a schedule to move this case forward. A new joint statement signed by Plaintiff and defense counsel shall be filed by 2/27/2018. In the event Plaintiff fails to contact Defendants' attorneys by 2/20/2018 Defendants shall file a notice so indicating. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Re: 55 Notice. The 51 Order to Show Cause is discharged. The stay that was imposed in this case is hereby LIFTED. The parties shall file a joint statement that includes a schedule for this case to proceed by 2/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the order to show cause entered in this case and/or file a notice of intent to proceed pro se in this case is extended to 1/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 49 Motion to Extend Time to Obtain Counsel. Deadline: 11/24/2017. The Court is not inclined to grant further extensions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 47 Motion for Extension of Time (First Request) to Obtain Counel. Any Response due by 9/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 41 Motion to Stay Case. The case is stayed until 9/25/2017. Defendant Touch LLC's 35 Motion to Consolidate Cases is Denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 36 Joinder to 35 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (Responses due by 8/22/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 28 Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures and Discovery. That notice should not have been filed and is hereby STRICKEN. Touch and its counsel are again INSTRUCTED to refrain from filing discovery documents on the docket in the future absent a Court order that they do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Striking the 23 Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures and Discovery. The Court instructs the parties to refrain from filing discovery documents on the docket in the future absent a Court order that they do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mueller v. Desert Palace, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVMPD Officer Karl Atkinson
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Represented By: Ryan W. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Palace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVMPD Officer Shawn Ford
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Represented By: Ryan W. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Represented By: Ryan W. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Touch LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Mueller
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?